Accounts and annual returns APOSTOLIC PREFECTURE OF THE FALKLANDS AND MISSION TO ST HELENA, TRISTAN DA CUNHA AND ASCENSION ISLAND CIO

Charity number: 1174770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window