THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S WITH CHRIST CHURCH AND HOLY TRINITY, DERBY

Charity number: 1175515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download