CORPUS CHRISTI CATHOLIC SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising events to raise valuable funds to support the school and enrich pupils education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 01 August 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Izabela Kowzan | Chair | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Simms | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ursula Baker | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Borgust | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tara Breeze | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Dennett | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Ianniciello | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Hingston | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isla Farotto | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Blathnaid Duffy | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aoife Ni Mhorain | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chanelle Wray | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.02k | £15.87k | £7.20k | £13.72k | £29.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.30k | £5.65k | £3.23k | £5.18k | £10.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 May 2021 | 329 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORPUS CHRISTI RC PRIMARY SCHOOL
TRENT ROAD
LONDON
SW2 5BL
- Phone:
- 02072744722
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window