Accounts and annual returns AVREICHIM GATESHEAD

Charity number: 1175534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 13 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 July 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2019 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required