VISION UK EYE HEALTH AND SIGHT LOSS CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR MISSION IS TO IMPROVE LIVES BY RAISING THE PRIORITY GIVEN TO EYE HEALTH AND SIGHT LOSS. WE WILL INVOLVE PRIVATE, PUBLIC AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS TO: IMPROVE THE NATION?S EYE HEALTH; ADDRESS AVOIDABLE SIGHT LOSS AND INVEST IN MEDICAL RESEARCH TO ADDRESS CURRENTLY UNAVOIDABLE SIGHT LOSS; JOIN-UP EYE HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICES; AND PROMOTE AN INCLUSIVE SOCIETY FOR ALL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.97k | £219.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.34k | £295.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 30 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE , FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF EYE HEALTH AND SIGHT LOSS CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: DEVELOPING AND PROMOTING A COLLABORATIVE EYE HEALTH AND SIGHT LOSS STRATEGY FOR THE UK, AND PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE AND OTHER CHARITABLE FORMS OF SUPPORT TO PEOPLE WITH EYE HEALTH AND SIGHT LOSS CONDITIONS; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO EYE HEALTH AND SIGHT LOSS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF RESEARCH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window