Financial history NUNEATON LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 510688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £22.00k £10.53k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £21.80k £10.53k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A