KIRKLANDS (MENSTON) TRUST

Charity number: 1175459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Gadd Trustee 04 October 2018
MENSTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Francis Ugboma Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
Edward James Brundle Trustee 15 November 2018 None on record
DALE SMITH Trustee 30 October 2017
CANTERBURY IMAGINE Received: On time
ABBEYFIELD THE DALES LIMITED Received: On time
Paul Howard Griffin Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
Nicola Dunn Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
David Mark Aldred Trustee 19 November 2020 None on record
Naomi Ruth McMorn Trustee 15 October 2020
FRIENDS OF MENSTON PRIMARY SCHOOL Received: On time
CHERYL THORNTON Trustee 04 October 2018 None on record
PETER FINLAY Trustee 30 October 2017
MENSTON MEMORIAL COTTAGE CHARITY Received: On time
RICHARD WIGHTMAN Trustee 04 October 2018 None on record