ST.AUSTELL U3A

Charity number: 1174637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required