POETS CORNER COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the trustees shall have power to establish or secure the establishment of a community hall and to maintain or manage or co-operate with any statutory authority in the maintenance and management of such a hall for activities promoted by the charity in furtherance of the above objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 06 September 2017: CIO registration
- POETS CORNER RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES ALEXANDER DONALD | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN JAMES SWAIN | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.32k | £2.12k | £147 | £753 | £593 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.53k | £1.82k | £1.78k | £1.54k | £1.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £125 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF POETS CORNER IN HIGH WYCOMBE COMPRISING CARVER HILL ROAD, ELLSWORTH ROAD, KEATS CLOSE, KINGSLEY CRESCENT, SHELLEY ROAD, TENNYSON ROAD AND WORDSWORTH ROAD (“THE NEIGHBOURHOOD”), WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY HALL AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A HALL FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 CARVER HILL ROAD
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP11 2TZ
- Phone:
- 03300536188
- Email:
- ENQUIRIES.PCCH@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window