Governing document THE HARROGATE COMPETITIVE FESTIVAL FOR MUSIC SPEECH AND DRAMA
Charity number: 510706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JUNE 1980 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOV 1998 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2014 as amended on 24 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR TO ADVANCE THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH, DRAMA AND DANCE IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.