SAMARITANS OF BURY ST EDMUNDS AND WEST SUFFOLK

Charity number: 1174114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2021 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021 20 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 March 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 28 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 March 2019 02 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2019 02 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time Download