SAMARITANS OF BURY ST EDMUNDS AND WEST SUFFOLK

Charity number: 1174114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 1972 AS AMENDED 21 JUNE 1993, JUNE 20 1994 AND 19 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN BURY ST EDMUNDS AND WEST SUSSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND (B) TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
ST EDMUNDS, WEST SUSSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 04 August 1977 : Standard registration