SAMARITANS OF BURY ST EDMUNDS AND WEST SUFFOLK

Charity number: 1174114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jill Partrica Turner Trustee 03 August 2017 None on record
Patrick Hung-Chow Hung Trustee 03 August 2017 None on record
Joan Golden Pawling Trustee 03 August 2017 None on record
Douglas Atter Trustee 16 November 2020 None on record
Miranda Felicity Martin Trustee 03 August 2017
MARKET WESTON VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
Simon William de Laat Trustee 19 August 2021 None on record
Richard Winch Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
Eamonn Jones Chair 17 February 2020 None on record
Vivian Helen Bewley Trustee 03 August 2017 None on record