INEED

Charity number: 1176589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 July 2019 On time Download