BHAKTI MARGA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bhakti Marga UK hosts multiple events to help one access the wisdom of their heart and develop their own unique relationship with the Divine. To grow devotion, we offer various events such as yoga & meditation, worship rituals, music & kirtan, devotional art, studies through Bhakti Marga academy, selfless service through seva programs and build communities around the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ratna Morjaria | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
MERLEESA GOVENDER | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERESA HALE | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sonam Shantilal | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.72k | £27.07k | £84.13k | £76.64k | £57.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.54k | £9.78k | £81.29k | £85.34k | £24.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF PARAMAHAMSA SRI SWAMI VISHWANANDA AND BHAKTI MARGA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE HINDU RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Lyndon Avenue
PINNER
HA5 4QF
- Phone:
- 07946239646
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window