LEGACY OF WAR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1174792
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICK STAINTHORPE Trustee 22 September 2017 None on record
Dawid Konotey-Ahulu Trustee 17 April 2017
CENTRE FOR AGEING BETTER LIMITED Received: On time
CHINEKE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Vivienne Ann Jennifer Guinness Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
Salvatore Petrone Trustee 28 July 2019
KIDSCAPE Recently registered
KIDSCAPE CAMPAIGN FOR CHILDREN'S SAFETY Received: On time
Esther Dakin-Poole Trustee 03 August 2020 None on record
Leslie-Ann Knott Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
LAUREN BELOTE FELTON Trustee 22 September 2017 None on record
Shehan Peter Hettiaratchy Trustee 09 June 2020
THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF PLASTIC RECONSTRUCTIVE AND AESTHETIC SURGEONS Received: On time