Accounts and annual returns CYNTHIA SPENCER HOSPICE CHARITY

Charity number: 1174402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 13 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 13 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 27 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 10 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 10 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window