THE WESTERN FRONT WAY

Charity number: 1174793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 03 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 03 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 20 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 13 June 2019 On time Download