Accounts and annual returns FAITH IN KIDS

Charity number: 1176335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2021 04 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2021 04 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 August 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2020 12 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 August 2019 23 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2019 23 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 August 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2018 24 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window