THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WALBERTON

Charity number: 1175197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time Download