THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WALBERTON

Charity number: 1175197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev TIMOTHY WARD Chair 07 October 2017
THE WALBERTON BINSTED AND WEST BARNHAM SICK POOR FUND Received: On time
Peter Brown Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
ANDREW BLUMER Trustee 29 April 2012 None on record
THOMAS EVANS Trustee 07 October 2017 None on record
SUSAN MARTINEAU Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Jean Strickland Trustee 21 April 2009
WALBERTON VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
THE WALBERTON BINSTED AND WEST BARNHAM SICK POOR FUND Received: On time
JULIE ALLDAY Trustee 07 October 2017 None on record
BERNARD LANE Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
Esther Vivien Langrish Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM DOMAN Trustee 02 November 2020
THE BASSIL SHIPPAM AND ALSFORD TRUST Received: On time
KEVIN DURBAN-JACKSON Trustee 23 January 2017 None on record
STEVEN PHILLIPS Trustee 07 October 2017 None on record
Graham Thrussell Trustee 18 November 2019
DAYLIGHT CHRISTIAN PRISON TRUST Received: On time