CDAC NETWORK LIMITED

Charity number: 1178168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 September 2019 On time Download