CDAC NETWORK LIMITED

Charity number: 1178168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Collier-Keywood Trustee 12 March 2019
The Chasah Trust Received: On time
BACE Received: On time
CHANGE DRIVERS Received: On time
Janet Marie Huddle Trustee 11 April 2019 None on record
JONATHAN MITCHELL Trustee 18 January 2017 None on record
Roseanna Parkyn Trustee 24 February 2021 None on record
Dr Geoff Loane Chair 05 December 2019 None on record