IT'S FOR THE KIDS

Charity number: 1176196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 September 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required