HAPPY BEES - FRIENDS OF HARRIS PRIMARY BECKENHAM

Charity number: 1174639
Charity reporting is overdue by 17 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 17 days
Accounts and TAR 06 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 17 days
Annual return 06 September 2019 07 November 2020 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 06 March 2019 25 February 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 March 2019 Not Required