Accounts and annual returns BRITISH ACADEMY OF CHILDHOOD DISABILITY

Charity number: 1177868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 10 May 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 02 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 15 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window