Accounts and annual returns PARTNERSHIP SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1175080
Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 23 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 23 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window