Trustees PARTNERSHIP SUPPORT GROUP
Charity number: 1175080
Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVER ARTHUR SEYMOUR MILLS | Chair | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shubhangi Karmakar | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Naz Asghar | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Tim Coppard | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Babatunde Adewopo | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Chester Manuel | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Peter Vincence Hasler | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.