Financial history THE SHEFFIELD PHILHARMONIC CHORUS

Charity number: 1175185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £30.88k £38.12k £80.87k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £28.70k £27.49k £50.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A