THE VICKY SERGIDES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1177611
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's aims are to focus on (a) raising awareness of stomach cancer (b) supporting research into stomach cancer and (c) assisting people or their family in the local area who may have received a cancer diagnosis. We raise money by hosting charity nights, runs, raffles.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £274
Total expenditure: £1,816

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARINA SERGIDES Chair 20 March 2018
None on record
THEONITSA SERGIDES Trustee 20 March 2018
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST AND ST ANTHONY
Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days
ONOUFRIOS CHRISTOFI Trustee 20 March 2018
None on record
MIGUEL GRANA Trustee 20 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £22.42k £4.70k £7.54k £1.70k £274
Total expenditure £15.06k £4.30k £10.23k £2.89k £1.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 December 2023 321 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 December 2023 321 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 September 2022 242 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 September 2022 242 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 February 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 September 2021 225 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
42 THE MALL
LONDON
N14 6LN
Phone:
07956363231
Website:

No information available