J&B CLEAVER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1174794
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 December 2020 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 November 2019 25 days late Download