Accounts and annual returns BSSN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1176706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 January 2020 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 January 2020 74 days late Download Open in new window