RESTORATION POWER MINISTRIES (RPMWORLDWIDE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration power ministries (Rpm Worldwide) is a community bible based church, established in Manchester, united kingdom. Our Sundays and weekdays services are open to all mankind, we love God and we demonstrate it by loving our neighbours. We have our worship every Sunday by 13:00 pm and prayer meeting/ bible study every last Tuesdays of the month by 18:00, At 100 Ashley lane Manchester M9 4NT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2021
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 January 2018: CIO registration
- RPM WORLDWIDE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLLINS ABRAHAM | Chair | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIBYLLE SCHENKEL | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUTH OLADELE - COKER | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADEYOOLA POPOOLA | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
OMOTOLA ODUMOSU | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
HILARY AKO | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ABRAHAM | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATIENCE IDIAGHE | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.06k | £4.56k | £3.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.98k | £5.08k | £2.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 432 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 432 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 798 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 798 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 April 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 14 April 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 April 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 23 April 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, ENGLAND AND WALES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP AND PRAYERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Saint Johns Church
100 Ashley Lane
Manchester
M9 4NT
- Phone:
- 07438983010
- Email:
- rpmworldwide@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window