FOUNDATION WELLBEING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE WELLBEING (PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN A SAFE, HEALTHY, ECO-FRIENDLY & PRO-RECYCLING ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 January 2018: CIO registration
- FOUNDATION NUTRITION TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARIANE MORIN | Chair | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUBRAMANIAM GURUNAIDU | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
KRYSTIAN OZOG | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 04 March 2023 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 04 March 2023 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 04 March 2023 | 459 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 04 March 2023 | 459 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 04 December 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 04 December 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Plot 4B
Brentford Business Centre
Commerce Road
Brentford
TW8 8LG
- Phone:
- 07975904903
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window