THE GILBERT AND SULLIVAN AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY, PRESTON

Charity number: 510838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2019 29 January 2021 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2018 05 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2016 Not Required