THE GILBERT AND SULLIVAN AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY, PRESTON

Charity number: 510838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/04/2016 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020
Total gross income £6.35k £8.59k £5.77k £7.69k £7.43k
Total expenditure £5.72k £7.35k £6.83k £5.17k £6.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A