THE GILBERT AND SULLIVAN AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY, PRESTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PERFORM THE WORKS OF GILBERT AND SULLIVAN IN LOCAL THEATRES FOR THE ENJOYMENT AND EDUCATION OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. THE SOCIETY NOW HAS PERFORMANCES 'SIGNED' FOR THE BENIFIT OF THE 'DEAF'. THE SOCIETY IS OPEN TO ALL, THE CURRENT AGE RANGE IS FROM 17 YEARS TO 80 YEARS. DISABILITY IS NO PROBLEM, THE LAST PERFORMANCE HAD ONE 'ON STAGE' IN A WHEELCHAIR'. THE NEXT PERFORMANCE HAS ONE ACTOR WITH M.S.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 12 January 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT WILLIAM ANTHONY FEELEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mary Janet Dawson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ernest Wright | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR MALCOLM MILNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN MARY MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE HURRELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.43k | £265 | £6.71k | £7.90k | £9.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.80k | £296 | £7.86k | £8.26k | £9.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE SOCIETY ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
(A) THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PROMOTION PRIMARILY OF THE WORKS OF GILBERT AND SULLIVAN IN CONCERT AND OPERATIC FORM. (B) TO ASSIST IN RAISING FUNDS FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT PRIMARILY PRESTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 OXFORD ROAD
BAMBER BRIDGE
PRESTON
PR5 6LQ
- Phone:
- 07982230671
- Email:
- info@prestongass.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window