NANT-Y-CWM STEINER SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 510849
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 October 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 October 2020 104 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 August 2017 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 29 August 2017 60 days late Download