NANT-Y-CWM STEINER SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 510849
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £175.91k £234.31k £295.52k £264.63k £231.65k
Total expenditure £148.02k £219.02k £265.23k £265.70k £235.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A