THE SAMATHA TRUST

Charity number: 1179867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Founded in 1973, The Samatha Trust is a Charitable Incorporated Organisation which fosters practice and study in the Samatha-Vipassana tradition. The Samatha Trust offers local weekly classes and residential meditation courses as well as online meditation classes and meetings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £137,205
Total expenditure: £124,043

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Germany
  • Netherlands

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 2018: CIO registration
  • 17 January 2022: Funds received from 266367 THE SAMATHA TRUST
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT ADKINS Chair 13 May 2001
None on record
Dr Mark Antony Rowlands Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
Angeline Woods Trustee 04 June 2016
None on record
Dr Charles King Trustee 04 June 2016
None on record
Deborah Raikes Trustee 04 June 2016
None on record
Frances Warren Trustee 07 June 2014
None on record
Professor JOHN ELSNER Trustee 13 May 2001
CORPUS CHRISTI COLLEGE OXFORD
Received: On time
CHARLES SHAW Trustee 15 June 1974
None on record
CHRIS GILCHRIST Trustee 29 May 1973
None on record
Dr Paul Dennison Trustee 28 May 1973
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £143.52k £367.67k £101.35k £137.21k
Total expenditure £0 £90.97k £103.17k £104.09k £124.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 03 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 13 April 2023 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 13 April 2023 67 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 20 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
41 YEW TREE LANE
POYNTON
STOCKPORT
SK12 1PT
Phone:
07515746590