THE EAST AFRICA HIGHER EDUCATION SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 1181419
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The making of grants to cover a portion of course fees for students of Nexus International University (based in Africa) who meet the Charity's criteria.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £410
Total expenditure: £6,813

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public. Works with a professional fundraiser with an agreement in place. It does not work with a commercial participator.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Kenya
  • Malawi
  • Nigeria
  • Sudan
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 2019: CIO registration
  • 04 January 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 04 January 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • EAST AFRICAN H.E FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.31k £410
Total expenditure £0 £6.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 November 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 November 2021 21 days late
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 January 2021 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 January 2021 75 days late