Financial history LEWES ORGANISATION IN SUPPORT OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity number: 1176074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £11.37k £13.74k £14.73k £8.40k £27.78k
Total expenditure £6.64k £13.86k £16.57k £9.18k £11.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £14.16k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A