Accounts and annual returns CHUMS CHARITY

Charity number: 1179048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 07 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 07 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 17 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 01 May 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 28 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window