THE SAI MAA LAKSHMI SHAKTI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 07 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL GREGG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
YOSHIKO YAMAGUCHI | Trustee |
|
||||||
CLINT HOUSEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 636 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 636 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1001 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1001 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1366 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1366 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1731 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1731 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
1.TO AID, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN THE RELIEF OF WOMEN FACING DISADVANTAGE WHETHER ECONOMIC AND/OR AS A RESULT OF FACING ABUSE OR VIOLENCE, INCLUDING BY OFFERING: COUNSELLING, MEDICAL AND LEGAL AID; SAFE SHORT-TERM ACCOMMODATION; PRACTICAL LIFE SKILLS AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING; CONTINUED SUPPORT SUCH THAT THESE WOMEN ARE ABLE TO RECLAIM THEIR LIVES WITH DIGNITY AND INTEGRITY. 3 TO AID IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING LIVES, INCLUDING BY: BRINGING HUNGER RELIEF TO THE VULNERABLE IN COUNTRIES SUCH AS INDIA; GIVING AID TO ASSIST IN THE RESTORATION OF SIGHT TO THOSE SUFFERING FROM CATARACTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 1, 55 PRINCES GATE
EXHIBITION ROAD
LONDON
SW72PG
- Phone:
- 02034892970
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window