Accounts and annual returns LIFE CONNECTION MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1179747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 25 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 25 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window