BEN ST JOSEPH TRUST

Charity number: 1177551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 01 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 04 April 2020 28 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 28 March 2021 52 days late Download
Annual return 04 April 2019 28 March 2021 418 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 28 March 2021 418 days late Download