BLESSED 2 BLESS COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £6,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 December 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEBERT DAWKINS | Chair | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sebert Martin | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Maye | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Reid | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Delroy Mason | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Harris | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Turner | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUZETTE DOUGLAS-JOHNSON | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANET DAWKINS | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.41k | £26.34k | £21.80k | £17.94k | £25.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.25k | £23.18k | £24.00k | £47.74k | £19.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 December 2023 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 21 November 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 21 November 2021 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 20 October 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 NOV 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21a Ablewell Street
Walsall
West Midlands
WS1 2EQ
- Phone:
- 07825740069
- Email:
- b2bcommproject@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window