THE FRIENDS OF ST ANTHONYS

Charity Number: 1176641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CHRISTMAS SCHOOL FAIR, DISCO, EASTER EGG BINGO, SCHOOL LABELS; ST ANTHONYS GOT TALENT AND SUMMER FAIR

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £8,637
Total expenditure: £3,751

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOSTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hayley Lloyd Chair 12 October 2022
None on record
Sharon Davies Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
EMMA WILSON Trustee 30 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.22k £25 £4.56k £7.27k £8.64k
Total expenditure £3.99k £361 £5.15k £1.92k £3.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Anthonys Catholic Primary Sch
St. Anthonys Drive
Fulwood
PRESTON
PR2 3SQ
Phone:
07867644842
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available