Trustees GMC CHARITY TO END FGM
Charity number: 1176359

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN MARGARET MAHY | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Sue Jennings | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Anne Henley | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Cox | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MUSIKILU MOJEED | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIA COOK | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CHARLES RUSBRIDGER | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.