NEWDIGATE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and provide recreational facilities for use of the residents in the Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 February 1981: Standard registration
- NEWDEGATE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL ANN HART | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Matthew Hitchcock | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Janet Mallett | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Councillor Robert Fletcher | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||
LINDA WEBSTER | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Robert Mee | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Charles Richard Brooks | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Flatley | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £11 | £21 | £8 | £8 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME 10 JULY 1980
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEE SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WEST HALLAM FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE OUT OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS, APPLY THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING LAND OR BUILDINGS TO BE SETTLED UPON TRUST FOR USE AS A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WEST HALLAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Louise Barber
3 High Lane West , West Hallam ,
ILKESTON , Derbyshire ,
DE7 6HQ
- Phone:
- 07986740189
- Email:
- contact@westhallam-pc.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window